Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Hansen | 01.02.1988 | 10.04.1997 | direktion |
Jørgen Martin Kallesen | 01.02.1988 | 17.10.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Hansen | 01.02.1988 | 10.04.1997 | bestyrelse |
Kaja Yvonne Appel | 01.02.1988 | 10.04.1997 | bestyrelse |
Katrine Hansen | 01.02.1988 | 10.04.1997 | formand |
Lone Vibeke Sørensen | 01.02.1988 | 06.06.1995 | bestyrelse |
Aage Toftdahl Søndergaard | 01.02.1988 | 04.08.1994 | formand |