Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Andersen | 01.01.1988 | 13.09.1991 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.01.1988 | 30.06.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Andersen | 01.01.1988 | 13.09.1991 | bestyrelse |
Dannie Mogensen | 01.01.1988 | 13.09.1991 | bestyrelse |
Henri Brixhe | 01.01.1988 | 13.09.1991 | bestyrelse |
Arne Vittinghoff Svendsen | 01.01.1988 | 23.06.1989 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.01.1988 | 30.06.1988 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.01.1988 | 30.06.1988 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.01.1988 | 30.06.1988 | formand |