Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bjarne Lynge Herlev Larsen | 01.01.1988 | 21.02.2005 | direktion |
John Johannes Madsen | 01.01.1988 | 12.10.1994 | direktion |
Elly Tove Madsen | 01.01.1988 | 18.01.1993 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.01.1988 | 11.04.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.01.1988 | 11.04.1988 | bestyrelse |