Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gunnar Vestergaard | 01.12.1987 | 08.05.1995 | direktion |
Vagn Linde | 01.12.1987 | 19.09.1989 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.12.1987 | 06.06.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gunnar Vestergaard | 01.12.1987 | 08.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Estrid Louise Vestergaard | 01.12.1987 | 08.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Julie Svendsen | 01.12.1987 | 08.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Poul Wentzer Licht | 01.12.1987 | 19.09.1989 | bestyrelse |
Ellen Marie Linde | 01.12.1987 | 19.09.1989 | bestyrelse |
Karsten Pultz Holm | 01.12.1987 | 19.09.1989 | bestyrelse |
Gunnar Vestergaard | 01.12.1987 | 19.09.1989 | formand |