Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Morten Andersen | 01.12.1987 | 22.04.1992 | direktion |
Ingrid Andersen | 01.12.1987 | 26.09.1991 | direktion |
Poul Erik Andersen | 01.12.1987 | 12.09.1991 | direktion |
Morten Andersen | 01.12.1987 | 15.02.1990 | direktion |
Søren Rasmussen | 01.12.1987 | 26.04.1989 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.12.1987 | 15.04.1988 | direktion |