Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Cay Cumberland Jacobsen | 15.03.1999 | 10.08.2006 | direktion |
Helge Bøtner Petersen | 01.07.1987 | 15.03.1999 | direktion |
Bjarne Cumberland Jacobsen | 01.07.1987 | 18.09.1995 | direktion |
Bjarne Cumberland Jacobsen | 01.07.1987 | 09.11.1993 | direktion |
John Cay Cumberland Jacobsen | 01.07.1987 | 22.10.1991 | direktion |