Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Reuter Johannsen | 15.12.1975 | 27.02.1998 | direktion |
Fritz Reuter Johannsen | 15.12.1975 | 06.12.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Reuter Johannsen | 15.12.1975 | 27.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
Søren Reuter Johannsen | 15.12.1975 | 21.10.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ole Henning Nielsen | 15.12.1975 | 20.02.1991 | bestyrelse |
Fritz Reuter Johannsen | 15.12.1975 | 06.12.1990 | bestyrelse |
Loreley Else Grethe Lotte Johannsen | 15.12.1975 | 03.07.1987 | bestyrelse |