Bestyrelse | Dato | Rolle |
---|---|---|
Jesper Larsson | 27.06.2001 | bestyrelse |
Bente Lundtofte Larsson | 30.05.1997 | bestyrelse |
Torben Michael Larsson | 19.12.1956 | bestyrelse |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Fritz Reuther | 19.12.1956 | 27.06.2001 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Dyreborg-Carlsen | 19.12.1956 | 30.05.1997 | bestyrelse |
Preben Pihl Nygaard | 19.12.1956 | 12.09.1989 | bestyrelse |