Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thorkild Levy Gruelund | 01.11.1987 | 12.10.1993 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.11.1987 | 19.08.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thorkild Levy Gruelund | 01.11.1987 | 12.10.1993 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Abben | 01.11.1987 | 12.10.1993 | bestyrelse |
Anne Gruelund | 01.11.1987 | 12.10.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ole Viggo Sonne Jensen | 01.11.1987 | 12.10.1993 | formand |
Steen Asger Poulsen | 01.11.1987 | 19.06.1991 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1987 | 19.08.1988 | bestyrelse |