Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Hermansen | 01.11.1987 | 04.07.1995 | direktion |
Michael Juhl | 01.11.1987 | 21.10.1991 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.11.1987 | 15.04.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Juhl | 01.11.1987 | 04.07.1995 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Oddvar Svanheld | 01.11.1987 | 04.07.1995 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1987 | 15.04.1988 | bestyrelse |