Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kristian Tyge Vendelbo | 01.11.1987 | 03.03.2003 | direktion |
Carl Erik Damm | 01.11.1987 | 20.12.1989 | direktion |
Kristian Tyge Vendelbo | 01.11.1987 | 22.01.1988 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.11.1987 | 27.11.1987 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1987 | 27.11.1987 | bestyrelse |