Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lise Leonhard Antonsen | 28.10.1996 | 12.12.2002 | direktion |
Peter Steen Antonsen | 21.09.1987 | 12.12.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lise Leonhard Antonsen | 28.10.1996 | 28.10.1996 | bestyrelse |
Peter Steen Antonsen | 21.09.1987 | 28.10.1996 | bestyrelse |
Palle Leonhard Antonsen | 21.09.1987 | 28.10.1996 | bestyrelse |
Kaj Kristen Ørnfeldt Clausen | 21.09.1987 | 22.09.1995 | bestyrelse |