Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Nielsen | 01.09.1987 | 08.03.1995 | direktion |
Loa Agnethe Olafsson McNeese | 01.09.1987 | 06.02.1989 | direktion |
Jens Nørskov | 01.09.1987 | 11.12.1987 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Nielsen | 01.09.1987 | 08.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Nielsen | 01.09.1987 | 08.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Loa Agnethe Olafsson McNeese | 01.09.1987 | 08.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Bach | 01.09.1987 | 24.05.1991 | bestyrelse |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.09.1987 | 11.12.1987 | bestyrelse |
Jens Nørskov | 01.09.1987 | 11.12.1987 | bestyrelse |
Søren Bonde | 01.09.1987 | 11.12.1987 | bestyrelse |