Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Egon Hansen | 01.06.1987 | 29.08.1990 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.06.1987 | 20.11.1987 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Sigurd Espersen | 01.06.1987 | 29.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Egon Hansen | 01.06.1987 | 29.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Aage Hjorth Hansen | 01.06.1987 | 29.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Hans Peter Andersen | 01.06.1987 | 29.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Arne Agerbak | 01.06.1987 | 11.04.1990 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.06.1987 | 20.11.1987 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.06.1987 | 20.11.1987 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.06.1987 | 20.11.1987 | formand |