Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Lyng Johannessen | 01.07.1987 | 22.08.1996 | direktion |
Benny Freed Thomsen | 01.07.1987 | 14.09.1989 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.07.1987 | 26.10.1987 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Karin Jeannette Loulou Eilertsen | 01.07.1987 | 22.08.1996 | bestyrelse |
Tove Christensen | 01.07.1987 | 22.08.1996 | bestyrelse |
Erik Lyng Johannessen | 01.07.1987 | 22.08.1996 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1987 | 26.10.1987 | bestyrelse |