Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Emil Gram | 21.01.1963 | 09.12.2017 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kit Green | 01.07.1996 | 26.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Jes Tougaard Gram | 01.07.1996 | 26.11.1997 | formand |
Ole Emil Gram | 21.01.1963 | 26.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Lis Tougaard | 21.01.1963 | 01.07.1996 | formand |