Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jakob Oldenborg Pedersen | 23.06.2014 | 31.05.2017 | direktion |
Lars Holger Hansen | 20.12.2009 | 23.06.2014 | direktion |
Henrik Holger Hansen | 15.01.2004 | 20.12.2009 | direktion |
Martin Holger Hansen | 01.06.1987 | 15.01.2004 | direktion |
Erik Holger Hansen | 01.06.1987 | 02.02.1996 | direktion |
Jørgen Per Beck-Jensen | 01.06.1987 | 03.03.1995 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.06.1987 | 01.12.1987 | direktion |