Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Knud Lynggaard | 01.03.1987 | 23.04.2001 | direktion |
Karl William Müller Carlsen | 01.03.1987 | 20.09.1990 | direktion |
Jonna Carlsen | 01.03.1987 | 20.09.1990 | direktion |
Ivan Skals Jensen | 01.03.1987 | 03.01.1989 | direktion |
Torben Magnussen | 01.03.1987 | 06.10.1988 | direktion |
Jens Nørskov | 01.03.1987 | 07.12.1987 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torben Magnussen | 01.03.1987 | 06.10.1988 | bestyrelse |
Troels Emil Wendel | 01.03.1987 | 06.10.1988 | bestyrelse |
Ivan Skals Jensen | 01.03.1987 | 06.10.1988 | formand |