Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Arne Høyer | 01.03.1987 | 10.02.1995 | direktion |
Jakobine Marie Jokiba Høyer | 01.03.1987 | 16.07.1990 | direktion |
Jan Thor Krøyer | 01.03.1987 | 02.10.1987 | direktion |
Jakob Skjoldan | 01.03.1987 | 02.10.1987 | direktion |
Christian Steen Notlevsen | 01.03.1987 | 02.10.1987 | direktion |