Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ralf Jerltorp | 01.02.1987 | 24.06.1997 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ralf Jerltorp | 01.02.1987 | 24.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Lissi Holst Lykkegaard | 01.02.1987 | 24.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Knud Erik Lykkegaard | 01.02.1987 | 24.06.1997 | formand |
Hardy Otto Mortensen | 01.02.1987 | 08.07.1991 | bestyrelse |
Henning Leopold Levin | 01.02.1987 | 08.04.1991 | bestyrelse |