Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Povl Bayer Knudsen | 13.03.1996 | 24.10.1997 | direktion |
Jan Quistgaard | 01.02.1987 | 13.03.1996 | direktion |
Niels Bukh | 01.02.1987 | 01.02.1995 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1987 | 31.08.1987 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peder Michael Anker Pruzan-Jørgensen | 30.09.1996 | 24.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Povl Bayer Knudsen | 13.03.1996 | 24.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Preben Rued Jørgensen | 01.02.1987 | 24.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Anne-Charlotte Margareta Jørgensen | 01.02.1987 | 30.09.1996 | bestyrelse |
Daniel Bar-Shalom | 01.02.1987 | 01.02.1995 | bestyrelse |
Niels Bukh | 01.02.1987 | 01.02.1995 | bestyrelse |
Jens William Werner | 01.02.1987 | 05.10.1994 | bestyrelse |
Michael Kubel | 01.02.1987 | 10.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
Bruno Miltoft | 01.02.1987 | 20.08.1991 | bestyrelse |
Daniel Bar-Shalom | 01.02.1987 | 23.03.1990 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Grau | 01.02.1987 | 23.03.1990 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Jørgensen Dall | 01.02.1987 | 06.06.1989 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.02.1987 | 31.08.1987 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1987 | 31.08.1987 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.02.1987 | 31.08.1987 | formand |