Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Victor Horst Greulich | 30.01.1998 | 31.12.2002 | direktion |
John Willem Norden | 21.08.1997 | 30.01.1998 | direktion |
Finn Jørgensen | 03.01.1996 | 21.08.1997 | direktion |
John Willem Norden | 01.02.1987 | 30.01.1996 | direktion |
Jørgen Rye Vind | 01.02.1987 | 20.01.1992 | direktion |
Ebbe Roy | 01.02.1987 | 30.07.1990 | direktion |
John Willem Norden | 01.02.1987 | 24.01.1990 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1987 | 09.09.1987 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Finn Jørgensen | 02.03.2001 | 31.12.2002 | formand |
Jan Willem Norden | 23.04.1999 | 31.12.2002 | bestyrelse |
Allan Beenfeldt | 23.04.1999 | 31.12.2002 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Pape Lindberg | 30.01.1998 | 31.12.2002 | bestyrelse |
Kenneth Rafn-Larsen | 30.01.1998 | 02.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Hey | 29.11.1996 | 30.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Allan Beenfeldt | 29.11.1996 | 30.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Christian Hans Eyvind Christiansen | 09.12.1994 | 23.04.1999 | bestyrelse |
Robert Gert Jensen | 09.12.1994 | 29.11.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jan Hauder | 09.12.1994 | 29.11.1996 | bestyrelse |
Erik Andersen | 01.02.1987 | 23.04.1999 | bestyrelse |
Morten Kjeldsen | 01.02.1987 | 30.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
John Willem Norden | 01.02.1987 | 09.12.1994 | bestyrelse |
Peter Lindal Jørgensen | 01.02.1987 | 09.12.1994 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Elmer Nielsen | 01.02.1987 | 09.12.1994 | bestyrelse |
Robert Gert Jensen | 01.02.1987 | 20.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Rye Vind | 01.02.1987 | 20.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Finn Jørgensen | 01.02.1987 | 20.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Henning Krebs Mikkelsen | 01.02.1987 | 20.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Morten Kjeldsen | 01.02.1987 | 24.01.1990 | bestyrelse |
Peter Lindal Jørgensen | 01.02.1987 | 24.01.1990 | bestyrelse |
Stig Jørgensen | 01.02.1987 | 15.03.1989 | bestyrelse |
Jan Hauder | 01.02.1987 | 15.03.1989 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.02.1987 | 09.09.1987 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1987 | 09.09.1987 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.02.1987 | 09.09.1987 | formand |