Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent Axel Nielsen | 01.02.1987 | 15.01.1999 | direktion |
Henning Ovesen | 01.02.1987 | 10.07.1989 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1987 | 06.10.1987 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Axel Nielsen | 01.02.1987 | 15.01.1999 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Axel Nielsen | 01.02.1987 | 15.01.1999 | bestyrelse |
Bent Axel Nielsen | 01.02.1987 | 15.01.1999 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Bøg-Jensen | 01.02.1987 | 10.07.1989 | bestyrelse |
Birgitte Jørgensen | 01.02.1987 | 10.07.1989 | bestyrelse |
Henning Ovesen | 01.02.1987 | 10.07.1989 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.02.1987 | 06.10.1987 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1987 | 06.10.1987 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.02.1987 | 06.10.1987 | formand |