Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Dorrit Dessauer | 24.06.1986 | 24.04.2008 | direktion |
Hanna Sara Solove | 24.06.1986 | 24.04.2008 | direktion |
Joseph Solove | 24.06.1986 | 29.11.1996 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Falk Dessauer | 24.06.1986 | 29.11.1996 | bestyrelse |
Joseph Solove | 24.06.1986 | 29.11.1996 | bestyrelse |
Dorrit Dessauer | 24.06.1986 | 29.11.1996 | bestyrelse |
Hanna Sara Solove | 24.06.1986 | 29.11.1996 | bestyrelse |
Allan Falk | 24.06.1986 | 11.03.1992 | bestyrelse |