Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Svend Falk Henriksen | 01.08.1986 | 27.04.2021 | direktion |
William Jørgensen | 01.08.1986 | 29.12.1996 | direktion |
Preben Wolff | 01.08.1986 | 29.12.1996 | direktion |
Tage Hammer | 01.08.1986 | 28.07.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Sanne Marie Larsen | 29.08.2018 | 27.04.2021 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Susanne Helene Larsen | 29.12.1996 | 27.04.2021 | formand |
Poul Christensen | 29.12.1996 | 29.08.2018 | bestyrelse |
Svend Falk Henriksen | 01.08.1986 | 27.04.2021 | bestyrelse |
John Kvist Nielsen | 01.08.1986 | 29.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Ole Knudsen | 01.08.1986 | 29.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Finn Kongsmark Flanding | 01.08.1986 | 29.12.1996 | formand |
Ole Søndergaard | 01.08.1986 | 29.12.1996 | næstformand |
Alan Bertram Wærum Lauritzen | 01.08.1986 | 12.04.1995 | bestyrelse |
Erik Villadsen | 01.08.1986 | 12.04.1995 | bestyrelse |
Anders Kenji Jensen | 01.08.1986 | 12.04.1995 | personlig_suppleant |
Ove Sørensen | 01.08.1986 | 12.04.1995 | personlig_suppleant |
Ib Yde | 01.08.1986 | 12.04.1995 | formand |
Kaj Birk Jensen | 01.08.1986 | 19.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Ejgil Hein | 01.08.1986 | 19.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Leif Aandahl | 01.08.1986 | 19.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Geir Magnus Jansen | 01.08.1986 | 05.05.1994 | formand |
Peder Christian Pedersen | 01.08.1986 | 05.05.1994 | næstformand |
Erik Bach Larsen | 01.08.1986 | 09.04.1990 | bestyrelse |
Norman Klitgaard Kristiansen | 01.08.1986 | 09.04.1990 | bestyrelse |
Ib Yde | 01.08.1986 | 12.01.1989 | formand |
Tage Hammer | 01.08.1986 | 28.07.1988 | bestyrelse |
Niels Michael Andersen | 01.08.1986 | 28.07.1988 | bestyrelse |