Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Kai Hornbæk | 25.09.1998 | 21.08.2012 | direktion |
Eva Maria Lissa Helgard Mourey | 15.08.1986 | 25.09.1998 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 15.08.1986 | 14.04.1987 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Eva Maria Lissa Helgard Mourey | 15.08.1986 | 26.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
I.S Mourey | 15.08.1986 | 26.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Leif Cadovius | 15.08.1986 | 26.06.2002 | formand |
Jørgen Olsen | 15.08.1986 | 03.05.1988 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 15.08.1986 | 14.04.1987 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 15.08.1986 | 14.04.1987 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 15.08.1986 | 14.04.1987 | formand |