Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peder Michael Hauch | 15.08.1986 | 29.08.2001 | direktion |
Flemming Fausing Brokmose | 15.08.1986 | 16.11.1989 | direktion |
Peter Winding | 15.08.1986 | 22.09.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Aage Rask-Pedersen | 15.08.1986 | 29.08.2001 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Axel Egsgaard Pedersen | 15.08.1986 | 29.08.2001 | bestyrelse |
Peder Michael Hauch | 15.08.1986 | 29.08.2001 | bestyrelse |
Ole Hauch | 15.08.1986 | 29.08.2001 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Fausing Brokmose | 15.08.1986 | 16.11.1989 | bestyrelse |
Kjeld Gaarn Thomsen | 15.08.1986 | 22.09.1988 | bestyrelse |
Peter Winding | 15.08.1986 | 22.09.1988 | bestyrelse |