Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Hansen | 01.08.1986 | 29.01.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Ditlev Hansen | 20.05.1998 | 29.01.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jens Jørgen Linde | 16.02.1998 | 01.08.2000 | bestyrelse |
Ole Hansen | 01.08.1986 | 29.01.2008 | bestyrelse |
Robert Ditlev Hansen | 01.08.1986 | 29.01.2008 | bestyrelse |
Peer Pommergaard Jessen | 01.08.1986 | 20.05.1998 | bestyrelse |
Ditte Bonde Hansen | 01.08.1986 | 22.08.1996 | formand |
Poul Bunk-Jensen | 01.08.1986 | 27.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Vestergaard | 01.08.1986 | 27.10.1995 | formand |
Ditte Bonde Hansen | 01.08.1986 | 13.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Per Saatterup | 01.08.1986 | 20.12.1994 | bestyrelse |
Henning Leopold Levin | 01.08.1986 | 15.06.1994 | bestyrelse |
Ditte Bonde Hansen | 01.08.1986 | 15.06.1994 | bestyrelse |