Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Margareta Andersen | 12.05.1986 | 27.12.1994 | direktion |
Ole Grauballe | 12.05.1986 | 07.05.1991 | direktion |
Christian Andersen | 12.05.1986 | 14.12.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Georg Henriksen | 12.05.1986 | 27.12.1994 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Brandt | 12.05.1986 | 27.12.1994 | bestyrelse |
Margareta Andersen | 12.05.1986 | 27.12.1994 | bestyrelse |
Christian Andersen | 12.05.1986 | 17.09.1990 | bestyrelse |
Ole Grauballe | 12.05.1986 | 14.12.1988 | bestyrelse |