Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Arne Toft | 02.03.2004 | 21.12.2010 | direktion |
Lars Knudsen | 05.02.1986 | 23.10.2003 | direktion |
Torben Woller Rasmussen | 05.02.1986 | 06.01.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Knud Jensen | 18.10.2000 | 26.09.2007 | bestyrelse |
Lars Knudsen | 05.02.1986 | 23.10.2003 | bestyrelse |
Leif Wiid Jakobsen | 05.02.1986 | 18.10.2000 | bestyrelse |
Torben Woller Rasmussen | 05.02.1986 | 06.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Eva Balle | 05.02.1986 | 06.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Hans Erik Dyhr Jensen | 05.02.1986 | 24.01.1989 | bestyrelse |