Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Karsten Erik Behrens | 21.10.1998 | 15.04.2002 | direktion |
Karin Behrens | 12.06.1998 | 21.10.1998 | direktion |
Karsten Erik Behrens | 02.12.1985 | 12.06.1998 | direktion |
Henning Schou | 02.12.1985 | 30.03.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Preben Astrup Enghoff | 31.12.1997 | 31.12.1997 | bestyrelse |
Palle Søby | 02.12.1985 | 31.12.1997 | bestyrelse |
Karsten Erik Behrens | 02.12.1985 | 31.12.1997 | bestyrelse |
Henning Schou | 02.12.1985 | 02.12.1992 | bestyrelse |
Anker Birk Petersen | 02.12.1985 | 02.12.1992 | bestyrelse |
Finn Vallø | 02.12.1985 | 02.12.1992 | formand |
Jan Hollmén Olesen | 02.12.1985 | 08.11.1988 | formand |