Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Wessmann Jensen | 01.02.1986 | 11.03.1991 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1986 | 19.12.1986 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Oskar Iver Jensen | 01.02.1986 | 11.03.1991 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Wessmann Jensen | 01.02.1986 | 11.03.1991 | bestyrelse |
Lisbeth Wessmann | 01.02.1986 | 11.03.1991 | bestyrelse |
Christian Molde | 01.02.1986 | 19.02.1990 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.02.1986 | 19.12.1986 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1986 | 19.12.1986 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.02.1986 | 19.12.1986 | formand |