Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Yaacov Safir | 09.12.2002 | 22.11.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jael Safir | 07.07.2004 | 22.11.2010 | bestyrelse |
Steen Villemoes | 18.12.2003 | 08.07.2004 | bestyrelse |
Dorte Kirsten Albrechtsen | 23.10.2003 | 22.11.2010 | formand |
Håkun Andreas Djurhuus | 23.10.2003 | 18.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Yaacov Safir | 09.12.2002 | 22.11.2010 | bestyrelse |
Marianne Sandager | 09.12.2002 | 23.10.2003 | bestyrelse |
Lars Henrik Andersen | 09.12.2002 | 23.10.2003 | formand |