Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Freddy Vognbjerg Mouritsen | 22.04.2003 | 02.06.2010 | direktion |
Kim Madsen | 01.10.2002 | 22.04.2003 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Agnethe Kaasgaard | 19.02.2008 | 02.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Lau Kofoed Kierstein | 19.02.2008 | 02.06.2010 | formand |
Hans Peder Aarre | 30.11.2007 | 03.01.2008 | formand |
Carl Aage Nielsen | 12.10.2006 | 30.11.2007 | formand |
Freddy Vognbjerg Mouritsen | 28.11.2005 | 02.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Agnethe Kaasgaard | 22.04.2003 | 12.10.2006 | bestyrelse |
Poul Sønderbæk | 22.04.2003 | 15.05.2006 | bestyrelse |
Poul Michael Bjørnskov | 22.04.2003 | 28.11.2005 | formand |
Kim Madsen | 01.10.2002 | 22.04.2003 | bestyrelse |
Helle Garde Carlsen | 01.10.2002 | 22.04.2003 | bestyrelse |
Annemette Heller | 01.10.2002 | 22.04.2003 | formand |