Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Holstein | 02.01.1986 | 30.04.1996 | direktion |
Poul Erik Marvig | 02.01.1986 | 13.04.1994 | direktion |
Ole Dupont | 02.01.1986 | 06.08.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Paul Francois Lambert | 02.01.1986 | 30.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Gerard Rene Kircher | 02.01.1986 | 30.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Marc Weissberg | 02.01.1986 | 30.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Wilhelmus Catharinus Odems | 02.01.1986 | 04.09.1995 | bestyrelse |
Jens Terkel Lund-Nielsen | 02.01.1986 | 31.05.1994 | formand |
Preben Edvard Kønig | 02.01.1986 | 06.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Ole Dupont | 02.01.1986 | 06.08.1990 | bestyrelse |