Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rudi Birkedal | 02.05.2012 | 29.04.2014 | direktion |
Rune Christiansen | 26.06.2008 | 02.05.2012 | direktion |
Jan Wium Wichmann | 16.12.2002 | 26.06.2008 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.07.2001 | 16.12.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Heino Grundtvig | 26.06.2008 | 29.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Torsten Kjærsgaard | 26.06.2008 | 29.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Jan Wium Wichmann | 26.06.2008 | 29.04.2014 | formand |
Tim Wium Wichmann | 09.11.2007 | 26.06.2008 | bestyrelse |
Ellen Toudal Wichmann | 16.12.2002 | 26.06.2008 | bestyrelse |
Paul Engelsted | 16.12.2002 | 09.11.2007 | formand |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.07.2001 | 16.12.2002 | bestyrelse |
Sebastian Benjamin Bahn Christoffersen | 01.07.2001 | 16.12.2002 | bestyrelse |
Helen Mimi Janniche | 01.07.2001 | 16.12.2002 | bestyrelse |