Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Andersen Dromph | 02.01.1986 | 11.06.1990 | direktion |
Knud Gravad | 02.01.1986 | 01.07.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Brandi | 02.01.1986 | 11.06.1990 | bestyrelse |
Erik Andersen Dromph | 02.01.1986 | 11.06.1990 | bestyrelse |
Leif Lund Andresen | 02.01.1986 | 11.06.1990 | bestyrelse |
Knud Gravad | 02.01.1986 | 11.06.1990 | bestyrelse |
Jens-Peter Madsen | 02.01.1986 | 11.06.1990 | bestyrelse |
Laurids Andersen Jessen | 02.01.1986 | 11.06.1990 | bestyrelse |
Erik Bastrup Olsen | 02.01.1986 | 24.05.1988 | bestyrelse |
Kirsten Rybjerg Jessen | 02.01.1986 | 06.07.1987 | bestyrelse |
Bertil Byskov | 02.01.1986 | 06.07.1987 | bestyrelse |