Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gunnar Sandbjerg | 01.02.1986 | 23.05.1992 | direktion |
Kim Christensen | 01.02.1986 | 09.02.1989 | direktion |
Niels Smed Alexandersen | 01.02.1986 | 03.01.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Christensen | 01.02.1986 | 23.05.1992 | bestyrelse |
Gunnar Sandbjerg | 01.02.1986 | 23.05.1992 | bestyrelse |
Niels Smed Alexandersen | 01.02.1986 | 03.01.1989 | bestyrelse |