Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Helge Padegaard | 17.11.2003 | 05.09.2006 | direktion |
Claus Julius Holm | 22.05.2001 | 05.09.2006 | direktion |
Mikael Hansen | 22.05.2001 | 17.11.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Claus Julius Holm | 17.11.2003 | 05.09.2006 | bestyrelse |
Helge Padegaard | 17.11.2003 | 05.09.2006 | bestyrelse |
Mikael Hansen | 17.11.2003 | 09.06.2005 | formand |