Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rasmus Elmann Esmaeilzadeh Ingerslev | 20.11.2006 | 06.11.2007 | adm. dir |
Leif Christensen | 01.09.2005 | 15.09.2006 | direktion |
Susanne Hovmand | 10.05.2001 | 01.04.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Henrik Palm | 20.11.2006 | 06.11.2007 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Glistrup | 20.11.2006 | 06.11.2007 | formand |
Leif Christensen | 15.09.2006 | 20.11.2006 | bestyrelse |
Søren Elmann Ingerslev | 04.04.2005 | 06.11.2007 | bestyrelse |
Stefan Ek Lorenzen | 15.01.2003 | 15.02.2005 | bestyrelse |
Michael Lexner | 10.12.2001 | 15.09.2006 | bestyrelse |
Rasmus Elmann Esmaeilzadeh Ingerslev | 10.12.2001 | 04.04.2005 | formand |
Susanne Hovmand | 10.05.2001 | 04.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Stefan Ek Lorenzen | 10.05.2001 | 10.12.2001 | formand |