Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jóhann Magnússon | 26.04.2010 | 07.10.2011 | direktion |
Gitte Weiss | 29.02.2008 | 26.04.2010 | direktion |
Jørgen Hougaard | 27.08.2002 | 23.10.2004 | direktør |
John Ytting Bak | 27.05.2002 | 29.02.2008 | direktion |
Jan Gotthilf Møller | 01.07.2001 | 27.05.2002 | adm. dir |
Jørgen Hougaard | 15.12.2000 | 01.07.2001 | direktion |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 15.11.2000 | 15.12.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jóhann Magnússon | 26.04.2010 | 07.10.2011 | bestyrelse |
Atul Shah | 26.04.2010 | 04.03.2011 | bestyrelse |
Audun Már Gudmundsson | 03.09.2009 | 07.10.2011 | formand |
Gitte Weiss | 03.09.2009 | 26.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
Stephen Kavanagh | 03.09.2009 | 26.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
Lars Fellenius | 06.03.2008 | 03.09.2009 | bestyrelse |
Per Hallberg | 06.03.2008 | 03.09.2009 | formand |
Ola Kristoffer Johansson | 23.10.2004 | 06.03.2008 | bestyrelse |
Doris Elisabeth Johansson | 23.10.2004 | 06.03.2008 | bestyrelse |
Gerda Bach Bak | 23.10.2004 | 06.03.2008 | formand |
John Ytting Bak | 27.05.2002 | 03.09.2009 | bestyrelse |
Niels Erik Holgersson | 27.05.2002 | 23.10.2004 | bestyrelse |
Peter Pein-Lorenzen | 27.05.2002 | 23.10.2004 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Kristensen | 27.05.2002 | 23.10.2004 | formand |
Hans Inge Gustav Berglund | 19.03.2001 | 27.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Hougaard | 15.12.2000 | 27.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Jan Gotthilf Møller | 15.12.2000 | 27.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Niels Erik Knudsen | 15.12.2000 | 27.05.2002 | formand |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 15.11.2000 | 15.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Annemette Heller | 15.11.2000 | 15.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Kim Madsen | 15.11.2000 | 15.12.2000 | formand |