Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent Karlsmark | 17.12.1985 | 09.12.1992 | direktion |
Birthe Marie Kruse | 17.12.1985 | 09.12.1992 | direktion |
Benny Willy Carlsen | 17.12.1985 | 03.11.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent Karlsmark | 17.12.1985 | 09.12.1992 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Medegaard | 17.12.1985 | 09.12.1992 | bestyrelse |
Niels Agerbek Christensen | 17.12.1985 | 09.12.1992 | bestyrelse |
Inge Herdis Wulff | 17.12.1985 | 03.11.1989 | bestyrelse |
Niels Georg Kruse | 17.12.1985 | 12.09.1989 | bestyrelse |