Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ulla Wulff Hansen | 17.11.2003 | 02.01.2008 | direktion |
Ulla Wulff Hansen | 17.11.2003 | 17.11.2003 | direktion |
Popi Christodoulou | 13.11.2000 | 02.01.2008 | direktion |
Steen Schierbeck | 01.07.2000 | 13.11.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ulla Wulff Hansen | 17.11.2003 | 17.11.2003 | bestyrelse |