Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anders Edward Atterling | 26.04.2007 | 15.09.2008 | direktion |
Finn Wollesen Petersen | 14.10.2003 | 26.04.2007 | direktion |
Mats Ove Anders Werne | 10.04.2003 | 14.10.2003 | direktion |
Nesa Latkovic | 24.01.2002 | 10.04.2003 | adm. dir |
Niels Prip | 20.05.1997 | 11.01.2002 | adm. dir |
Eric Stefan Johansson | 16.04.1997 | 20.05.1997 | adm. dir |
Bengt-Olof Jansson | 22.05.1995 | 16.04.1997 | direktion |
Morten Neergård Skrydstrup | 15.12.1985 | 22.05.1995 | direktion |
Bjørk Franklin Aagaard Petersen | 15.12.1985 | 12.06.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Björn Strömberg | 16.01.2008 | 15.09.2008 | formand |
Hans Anders Lövgren | 28.11.2007 | 15.09.2008 | bestyrelse |
Sune Pierre Dicksson | 23.05.2006 | 16.01.2008 | formand |
Lars Olof Idmyr | 23.05.2006 | 13.11.2007 | bestyrelse |
Finn Wollesen Petersen | 11.11.2003 | 26.04.2007 | bestyrelse |
Kenneth Mikael Gustafsson | 11.11.2003 | 23.05.2006 | formand |
Roger Mikael Gustavsson | 11.11.2003 | 11.11.2003 | formand |
Anders Edward Atterling | 26.06.2003 | 15.09.2008 | bestyrelse |
Bengt Arne Nilsson | 10.04.2003 | 11.11.2003 | formand |
Mats Ove Anders Werne | 10.04.2003 | 14.10.2003 | bestyrelse |
Per Stefan Andersson | 24.03.2003 | 26.06.2003 | bestyrelse |
Morten Neergård Skrydstrup | 04.03.2003 | 20.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Søren Bech | 04.03.2003 | 31.10.2004 | personlig_suppleant |
Camilla Caroline Horn | 04.03.2003 | 31.10.2004 | personlig_suppleant |
Nesa Latkovic | 24.01.2002 | 09.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Hans Ingvar Johansson | 14.12.2001 | 14.12.2001 | bestyrelse |
Leif Juul Jørgensen | 24.04.2001 | 11.11.2003 | næstformand |
Kenneth Mikael Gustafsson | 22.06.2000 | 18.05.2001 | næstformand |
Søren Bech | 10.09.1998 | 04.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Preben Thuren Larsen | 10.09.1998 | 04.03.2003 | personlig_suppleant |
Søren Bech | 10.09.1998 | 30.10.1997 | suppleant |
Bengt-Olof Jansson | 22.05.1995 | 16.04.1997 | bestyrelse |
Jens Dalgaard | 15.12.1985 | 20.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Rasmus Bayer | 15.12.1985 | 04.03.2003 | personlig_suppleant |
Torben Mejnertsen | 15.12.1985 | 14.12.2001 | bestyrelse |
Eric Stefan Johansson | 15.12.1985 | 28.09.2000 | næstformand |
Sven Olof Stenarson | 15.12.1985 | 22.05.2000 | formand |
Hans Stevelt | 15.12.1985 | 30.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Günter Walter Paul Vögeli | 15.12.1985 | 02.09.1996 | personlig_suppleant |
Michael Mardahl Amstrup | 15.12.1985 | 22.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Gunner Jensen | 15.12.1985 | 13.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Bjørk Franklin Aagaard Petersen | 15.12.1985 | 13.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Holger Evald Terpet | 15.12.1985 | 13.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Ole Lindberg Olesen | 15.12.1985 | 13.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Morten Neergård Skrydstrup | 15.12.1985 | 13.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Søren Bech | 15.12.1985 | 13.03.1995 | personlig_suppleant |
Stig Eide Joensen | 15.12.1985 | 13.03.1995 | formand |
Finn Thomsen | 15.12.1985 | 06.02.1995 | bestyrelse |
Poul-Erik Rasmussen | 15.12.1985 | 06.02.1995 | bestyrelse |
Erik Schilder | 15.12.1985 | 15.02.1994 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Kanstrup | 15.12.1985 | 10.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Ellen Lid Andersen | 15.12.1985 | 10.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Ole Hans Rønn Boisen | 15.12.1985 | 10.01.1994 | personlig_suppleant |
Hans Stevelt | 15.12.1985 | 10.01.1994 | personlig_suppleant |
Erik Torben Møller | 15.12.1985 | 10.01.1994 | personlig_suppleant |
Stig Eide Joensen | 15.12.1985 | 21.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Hans Kjærgaard | 15.12.1985 | 22.11.1991 | bestyrelse |
Dag Rogne | 15.12.1985 | 22.11.1991 | bestyrelse |
Stig Eide Joensen | 15.12.1985 | 21.11.1990 | bestyrelse |
Johannes Alfred Christensen | 15.12.1985 | 21.11.1990 | bestyrelse |
Poul Henning Nielsen | 15.12.1985 | 21.11.1990 | bestyrelse |
Peter Ilkjær Madsen | 15.12.1985 | 21.11.1990 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Kanstrup | 15.12.1985 | 21.11.1990 | personlig_suppleant |
Ellen Lid Andersen | 15.12.1985 | 21.11.1990 | personlig_suppleant |
Gunnar Toft Madsen | 15.12.1985 | 17.11.1989 | bestyrelse |
Niels Fisker-Andersen | 15.12.1985 | 18.01.1989 | bestyrelse |
Hans Kjærgaard | 15.12.1985 | 18.01.1989 | bestyrelse |
Preben Agner | 15.12.1985 | 18.01.1989 | bestyrelse |