Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kurt Herman Mathiasen | 13.10.2000 | 11.01.2006 | direktion |
Peter Frank Hansen | 19.01.2000 | 13.10.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anna Marie Zætteberg Mathiasen | 21.05.2003 | 11.01.2006 | bestyrelse |
Allan Thyrrestrup | 21.05.2003 | 11.01.2006 | formand |
Kurt Herman Mathiasen | 13.10.2000 | 11.01.2006 | bestyrelse |
Kent Nielsen | 13.10.2000 | 21.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Poul Thorup | 19.01.2000 | 13.10.2000 | bestyrelse |
Peter Frank Hansen | 19.01.2000 | 13.10.2000 | bestyrelse |
Hans Bekkevold | 19.01.2000 | 13.10.2000 | bestyrelse |