Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hanne Lund | 15.12.1953 | 30.05.1996 | direktion |
Ole Toppenberg | 15.12.1953 | 30.05.1996 | adm. dir |
Kjeld Peter Knarreborg | 15.12.1953 | 01.12.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Tvede-Møller | 15.12.1953 | 30.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Henning Østergaard | 15.12.1953 | 30.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Niels Thorsen | 15.12.1953 | 30.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Doris Hermine Friis | 15.12.1953 | 30.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Gerrit Dirk Toet | 15.12.1953 | 30.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
John Astrup Lundsgaard | 15.12.1953 | 30.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Erik Søndergaard | 15.12.1953 | 30.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jens Thorsen | 15.12.1953 | 30.05.1996 | formand |
Mogens Granborg | 15.12.1953 | 30.05.1996 | næstformand |
Jens Christian Lorenzen | 15.12.1953 | 03.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Erling Christensen | 15.12.1953 | 26.04.1994 | bestyrelse |
Bendt Hansen | 15.12.1953 | 26.04.1994 | bestyrelse |
Jens Henning Andersen | 15.12.1953 | 26.04.1994 | personlig_suppleant |
Torben Axel Monberg | 15.12.1953 | 04.05.1993 | bestyrelse |
Nils Oluf Friherre Ehrenskjold | 15.12.1953 | 26.08.1992 | bestyrelse |
Lone Nielsen | 15.12.1953 | 26.03.1992 | bestyrelse |
Doris Hermine Friis | 15.12.1953 | 26.03.1992 | personlig_suppleant |
Per Skou Hansen | 15.12.1953 | 21.11.1991 | bestyrelse |
Bendt Hansen | 15.12.1953 | 21.11.1991 | personlig_suppleant |
Kim Aage Westphalen | 15.12.1953 | 31.07.1990 | personlig_suppleant |
Gorm Schibler | 15.12.1953 | 22.06.1990 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Peter Jørgensen | 15.12.1953 | 22.06.1990 | bestyrelse |
Svend Otto Lange Laaldrup | 15.12.1953 | 22.06.1990 | personlig_suppleant |
Rasmus Wilhelm Jensen | 15.12.1953 | 30.05.1989 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Peter Jørgensen | 15.12.1953 | 30.05.1989 | personlig_suppleant |
Hans Peter Holm | 15.12.1953 | 31.05.1988 | bestyrelse |