Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jenny Margrethe Thorø | 12.04.2000 | 12.04.2008 | direktion |
Kurt Thorø | 21.12.1981 | 12.04.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jenny Margrethe Thorø | 12.04.2000 | 12.04.2000 | bestyrelse |
Kurt Thorø | 21.12.1981 | 12.04.2000 | bestyrelse |
Richard Baagøe Olsen | 21.12.1981 | 12.04.2000 | bestyrelse |
Thorkild Broch | 21.12.1981 | 30.03.1995 | bestyrelse |