Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Alex Rue Rasmussen | 30.04.2002 | 01.05.2003 | direktion |
Torben Mortensen | 12.11.1979 | 30.04.2002 | direktion |
Poul Lauridsen | 12.11.1979 | 06.04.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Alex Rue Rasmussen | 30.04.2002 | 01.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Glen Kurt Gustav Nilsson | 02.03.2000 | 01.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Alf Gerald Engstrom | 12.11.1979 | 01.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Torben Mortensen | 12.11.1979 | 30.04.2002 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Kræfting | 12.11.1979 | 02.03.2000 | bestyrelse |