Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Rolf Fahrenholtz-Jensen | 14.12.1998 | 02.06.2014 | direktion |
Morten Knudsen | 03.07.1985 | 14.12.1998 | direktion |
Jan Busch Carlsen | 03.07.1985 | 04.01.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Elisabet Birgit Ingegerd Fahrenholtz-Jensen | 14.12.1998 | 02.06.2014 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Rolf Fahrenholtz-Jensen | 03.07.1985 | 02.06.2014 | bestyrelse |
Kirsten Fahrenholtz-Jensen | 03.07.1985 | 02.06.2014 | bestyrelse |
Morten Knudsen | 03.07.1985 | 14.12.1998 | bestyrelse |
Jan Busch Carlsen | 03.07.1985 | 16.09.1991 | bestyrelse |
Peter Morten Andreassen | 03.07.1985 | 16.09.1991 | bestyrelse |
Annemarie Kruse-Madsen | 03.07.1985 | 04.01.1989 | bestyrelse |
Finn Rønberg | 03.07.1985 | 04.01.1989 | bestyrelse |