Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Martin Sjøbohm | 05.12.1980 | 22.11.1994 | direktion |
Jørn Aage Dupont | 05.12.1980 | 15.10.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Eva Elisabet Sjøbohm | 05.12.1980 | 22.11.1994 | bestyrelse |
Lars Goran Gustafsson | 05.12.1980 | 22.11.1994 | bestyrelse |
Jan Tomas Hellstrom | 05.12.1980 | 22.11.1994 | bestyrelse |
Per Martin Sjøbohm | 05.12.1980 | 03.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Aage Dupont | 05.12.1980 | 15.10.1990 | bestyrelse |
Carmen Bramsensgaard Dupont | 05.12.1980 | 15.10.1990 | bestyrelse |
John Perrine Horton | 05.12.1980 | 15.10.1990 | bestyrelse |
Erik Meldgaard | 05.12.1980 | 28.11.1988 | bestyrelse |